E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3831
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1348
|
Journal Page: 5246
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5245
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5389
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3780
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5384
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5384
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3640
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3240
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3240
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3240
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4734
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4734
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4734
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
|
|
Journal Page: 1725
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1725
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3091
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#726
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2802
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2802
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2802
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 915
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 915
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|