H.B. No. 3569 AN ACT relating to activities conducted in connection with a state or federal disease control or eradication program for animals. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 161, Agriculture Code, is amended by adding Section 161.0417 to read as follows: Sec. 161.0417. AUTHORIZED PERSONNEL FOR DISEASE CONTROL. (a) A person, including a veterinarian, must be authorized by the commission in order to engage in an activity that is part of a state or federal disease control or eradication program for animals. (b) The commission shall adopt rules for the authorization of a person described by Subsection (a). (c) The commission may, after reasonable notice, suspend or revoke a person's authorization under Subsection (a) if the commission determines that the person has substantially failed to comply with this chapter or rules adopted under this chapter. (d) A person is entitled to a hearing before the commission or a hearing examiner appointed by the commission before the commission may revoke the person's authorization under Subsection (a). The commission shall make all final decisions to suspend or revoke an authorization. (e) This section does not affect the requirement for a license or an exemption under Chapter 801, Occupations Code, to practice veterinary medicine. SECTION 2. Section 161.0601(a), Agriculture Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) The commission by rule may provide for the issuance, including electronically, of a certificate of veterinary inspection by a veterinarian to a person transporting livestock, exotic livestock, domestic fowl, or exotic fowl. SECTION 3. Not later than December 1, 2013, the Texas Animal Health Commission shall adopt rules as required by Section 161.0417, Agriculture Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3569 was passed by the House on May 9, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 5, 2 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 3569 on May 24, 2013, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 3569 on May 26, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3569 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 3569 on May 26, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor