Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3583 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Strama H.B. No. 3583


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to renewable energy technology capable of serving peak
 demand.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.904, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (o) and adding Subsection (d-1)
 to read as follows:
 (a)  It is the intent of the legislature that after January
 1, 2022, [by January 1, 2015, an additional 5,000] 10,880 megawatts
 of generating capacity from renewable energy technologies will have
 been installed in this state, 5,000 megawatts of which must be
 renewable energy technology capable of serving peak demand. The
 cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state shall total:
 (1)  6,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015, 1,000
 megawatts of which must be from renewable energy technology capable
 of serving peak demand and 5,880 megawatts of which may be from
 other renewable energy technologies;
 (2)  7,880 megawatts by January 1, 2016, 2,000
 megawatts of which must be from renewable energy technology capable
 of serving peak demand and 5,880 megawatts of which may be from
 other renewable energy technologies;
 (3)  8,880 megawatts by January 1, 2018, 3,000
 megawatts of which must be from renewable energy technology capable
 of serving peak demand and 5,880 megawatts of which may be from
 other renewable energy technologies;
 (4)  9,880 megawatts by January 1, 2020, 4,000
 megawatts of which must be from renewable energy technology capable
 of serving peak demand and 5,880 megawatts of which may be from
 other renewable energy technologies;
 (5)  10,880 megawatts after January 1, 2022, 5,000
 megawatts of which must be from renewable energy technology capable
 of serving peak demand and 5,880 megawatts of which may be from
 other renewable energy technologies[5,880 megawatts by January 1,
 2015, and the commission shall establish a target of 10,000
 megawatts of installed renewable capacity by January 1, 2025. The
 cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state shall total
 2,280 megawatts by January 1, 2007, 3,272 megawatts by January 1,
 2009,    4,264 megawatts by January 1, 2011, 5,256 megawatts by
 January 1, 2013, and 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015. Of the
 renewable energy technology generating capacity installed to meet
 the goal of this subsection after September 1, 2005, the commission
 shall establish a target of having at least 500 megawatts of
 capacity from a renewable energy technology other than a source
 using wind energy].
 (b)  The commission shall establish a renewable energy
 credits trading program. Any retail electric provider, municipally
 owned utility, or electric cooperative that does not satisfy the
 requirements of Subsection (a) by directly owning or purchasing
 capacity using renewable energy technologies shall purchase
 sufficient renewable energy credits to satisfy the requirements by
 holding renewable energy credits in lieu of capacity from renewable
 energy technologies.
 (d-1)  In this section, "renewable energy technology capable
 of serving peak demand" means a renewable energy technology that:
 (1)  may be dispatched by the operator regardless of
 environmental or weather conditions; or
 (2)  during the preceding year, provided energy at a
 capacity factor of at least 40 percent between 1 p.m. and 8 p.m. in
 June, July, August, and September.
 (o)  The commission may establish an alternative compliance
 payment. An entity that has a renewable energy purchase requirement
 under this section may elect to pay the alternative compliance
 payment instead of applying renewable energy credits toward the
 satisfaction of the entity's obligation under this section. The
 commission may establish a separate alternative compliance payment
 for the goal of installing 5,000 [500] megawatts of capacity from
 renewable energy technologies capable of serving peak demand [other
 than wind energy]. The alternative compliance payment for a
 renewable energy purchase requirement that could be satisfied with
 a renewable energy credit from wind energy may not be less than
 $2.50 per credit or greater than $20 per credit. Prior to September
 1, 2009, an alternative compliance payment under this subsection
 may not be set above $5 per credit. In implementing this subsection,
 the commission shall consider:
 (1)  the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
 retail competition;
 (2)  the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
 electric rates;
 (3)  the effect of the alternative compliance payment
 level on the renewable energy credit market; and
 (4)  any other factors necessary to ensure the
 continued development of the renewable energy industry in this
 state while protecting ratepayers from unnecessary rate increases.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.