Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1731
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#761
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2722
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2197
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2365
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 917
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 917
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|