E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3779
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4871
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4915
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4550
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2228
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#454
|
Journal Page: 2228
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2228
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2228
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 995
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 995
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|