E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5391
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3519
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4535
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4555
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4074
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2366
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2366
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2366
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2366
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2366
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2366
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2366
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1731
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#761
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2722
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 939
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 939
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|