House | 05/02/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2246 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1546 | Journal Page: 2246 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 995 | |
House | 03/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 995 | |
House | 03/08/2013 | Filed |