House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5384
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5384
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3404
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3404
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3070
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3070
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3070
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4070
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 2328
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2328
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2328
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1720
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#771
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2979
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Simmons
|
Journal Page: 2978
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2978
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|