House
|
05/09/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/28/13 6:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2924
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
5-Pickett
|
Journal Page: 2923
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2923
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#751
|
Journal Page: 2923
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
4-Naishtat
|
Journal Page: 2922
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amended
|
3-Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 2922
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2920
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1981
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|