Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3676 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 3676
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 14, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the application of restrictions on drivers under 18
 years of age.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 545.424(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  This section does not apply to:
 (1)  [the holder of a hardship license;
 [(2)]  a person operating a motor vehicle while
 accompanied in the manner required by Section 521.222(d)(2) for the
 holder of an instruction permit; or
 (2) [(3)]  a person licensed by the Federal
 Communications Commission to operate a wireless communication
 device or a radio frequency device.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *