Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3761 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guerra, Munoz, Jr. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 3761
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 8, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Rural Affairs, and Homeland Security; May 20, 2013,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 3, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a feasibility report on the creation of a border
 agricultural inspection training program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Section 12.049 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.049.  FEASIBILITY REPORT ON BORDER AGRICULTURAL
 INSPECTION TRAINING PROGRAM. (a) The department shall consider the
 feasibility of creating and administering a program to:
 (1)  train department employees to meet federal
 standards for agricultural inspectors performing inspections,
 other than inspections of animals as defined by Section 161.001, at
 ports of entry along the border with the United Mexican States; and
 (2)  allow department employees trained as provided by
 Subdivision (1) to assist the United States Customs and Border
 Protection and the United States Department of Agriculture with
 agricultural inspections, other than inspections of animals as
 defined by Section 161.001, at ports of entry along the border with
 the United Mexican States with the goal of reducing the wait time
 for an agricultural inspection of a vehicle.
 (b)  The department shall determine whether any agreements
 with the federal government are required to implement a program
 described by Subsection (a) and the nature of those agreements.
 (c)  Not later than December 31, 2014, the department shall
 submit a report to the committees of each house of the legislature
 with primary jurisdiction over agriculture concerning the
 feasibility of a program described by Subsection (a) and the nature
 of any agreements with the federal government required to implement
 the program.
 (d)  This section expires August 31, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *