Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2209
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#437
|
Journal Page: 2209
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2209
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2209
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2075
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 946
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 946
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|