Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3764 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 3764
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 8, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to audit requirements of certain emergency services
 districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 775, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 775.0821 to read as follows:
 Sec. 775.0821.  ALTERNATIVE TO AUDIT OF DISTRICT IN LESS
 POPULOUS COUNTIES. (a) This section applies only to a district to
 which Section 775.082 applies that:
 (1)  did not have any outstanding bonds or any
 outstanding liabilities having a term of more than one year during
 the previous fiscal year;
 (2)  did not receive more than a total of $250,000 in
 gross receipts from operations, loans, taxes, or contributions
 during the previous fiscal year; and
 (3)  did not have a total of more than $250,000 in cash
 and temporary investments during the previous fiscal year.
 (b)  Instead of filing an audit report under Section 775.082,
 a district to which this section applies may file compiled
 financial statements with the commissioners court of each county in
 which any part of the district is located.
 (c)  The district must file with the compiled financial
 statements an affidavit signed by an authorized district
 representative attesting to the accuracy and authenticity of the
 statements.
 (d)  The provisions of Section 775.082 relating to deadlines
 for filing an audit and the procedures and penalties relating to the
 failure of a district to file an audit apply to the filing of
 compiled financial statements under this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *