Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1195 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1195 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 889 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1562 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1519 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | RV#200 | Journal Page: 1519 |
House | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1519 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1519 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1504 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1504 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1202 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 303 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 303 | |
House | 01/08/2013 | Filed |