1 | 1 | | By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 3800 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Intergovernmental Relations; May 14, 2013, reported favorably by |
---|
5 | 5 | | the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the recording and indexing of property owners' |
---|
11 | 11 | | association management certificates in the county real property |
---|
12 | 12 | | records. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 209.004, Property Code, is amended by |
---|
15 | 15 | | adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (a-1) The county clerk of each county in which a management |
---|
17 | 17 | | certificate is filed as required by this section shall record the |
---|
18 | 18 | | management certificate in the real property records of the county |
---|
19 | 19 | | and index the document as a "Property Owners' Association |
---|
20 | 20 | | Management Certificate." |
---|
21 | 21 | | SECTION 2. To ensure that all management certificates are |
---|
22 | 22 | | recorded and indexed in accordance with Section 209.004(a-1), |
---|
23 | 23 | | Property Code, as added by this Act, on or after September 1, 2013, |
---|
24 | 24 | | and not later than January 1, 2014, each property owners' |
---|
25 | 25 | | association that is subject to Section 209.004, Property Code, |
---|
26 | 26 | | immediately before September 1, 2013, shall file the association's |
---|
27 | 27 | | management certificate under that section, regardless of whether |
---|
28 | 28 | | the association filed a management certificate before September 1, |
---|
29 | 29 | | 2013. This section does not affect the time in which a property |
---|
30 | 30 | | owners' association is required to file the association's |
---|
31 | 31 | | management certificate under Section 209.004, Property Code, as |
---|
32 | 32 | | amended by this Act, if the association's initial duty to file the |
---|
33 | 33 | | management certificate arises on or after September 1, 2013. |
---|
34 | 34 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
35 | 35 | | * * * * * |
---|