House | 05/02/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2170 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 265 | Journal Page: 2170 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1497 | |
House | 03/28/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 304 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 304 | |
House | 01/08/2013 | Filed |