House | 05/02/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1093 | Journal Page: 2190 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Printing rule suspended | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably as amended | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 953 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 953 | |
House | 03/13/2013 | Filed | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Record vote | RV#64 | Journal Page: 722 |
House | 03/13/2013 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 722 |