House | 05/13/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1679 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 953 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 953 | |
House | 03/15/2013 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Filed |