House | 05/14/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3200 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1862 | Journal Page: 3200 |
House | 05/14/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2277 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1679 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 1438 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1438 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Filed |