Senate | 05/17/2013 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1992 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1992 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1994 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3910 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3596 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Record vote | RV#924 | Journal Page: 3597 |
House | 05/17/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3597 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3597 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3537 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3537 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2551 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1698 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 1439 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1439 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Filed |