House | 04/30/2013 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 2164 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1574 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1574 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Filed |