1 | 1 | | By: M. Gonzalez of El Paso H.B. No. 3933 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) |
---|
3 | 3 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013; |
---|
4 | 4 | | May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural |
---|
5 | 5 | | Resources; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
6 | 6 | | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to the transfer of territory, assets, liabilities, and |
---|
12 | 12 | | duties of the former Cuadrilla Improvement Corporation to the Lower |
---|
13 | 13 | | Valley Water District. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. DEFINITIONS. In this Act: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (1) "Commission" means the Texas Commission on |
---|
17 | 17 | | Environmental Quality or, as appropriate, its predecessor, the |
---|
18 | 18 | | Texas Natural Resource Conservation Commission. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (2) "Corporation" means the Cuadrilla Improvement |
---|
20 | 20 | | Corporation. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (3) "Authority" means the Lower Valley Water District. |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 2. FINDINGS. (a) On July 8, 1992, the County of El |
---|
23 | 23 | | Paso, Texas, by and through the county judge of El Paso County, |
---|
24 | 24 | | quitclaimed the county's right, title, and interest in and to the |
---|
25 | 25 | | property and any improvements to the property described by Section |
---|
26 | 26 | | 3 of this Act, to the corporation by executing a quitclaim deed, |
---|
27 | 27 | | record number 009280, as recorded in the county records of El Paso |
---|
28 | 28 | | County. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (b) The El Paso Water Control and Improvement District No. 4 |
---|
30 | 30 | | assumed the responsibilities as temporary manager of the |
---|
31 | 31 | | corporation, including the provision of water and wastewater |
---|
32 | 32 | | services to customers of the corporation by emergency order issued |
---|
33 | 33 | | by the commission on September 30, 1999, and confirmed by the |
---|
34 | 34 | | commission on October 27, 1999. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (c) The corporation was involuntarily dissolved by order of |
---|
36 | 36 | | the secretary of state on July 18, 2007. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (d) The El Paso Water Control and Improvement District No. 4 |
---|
38 | 38 | | no longer wishes to continue providing service to the former |
---|
39 | 39 | | corporation's customers, and the authority is willing to provide |
---|
40 | 40 | | and capable of providing that service and of assuming any other |
---|
41 | 41 | | duties of the former corporation, provided that the authority is |
---|
42 | 42 | | granted any remaining assets of the former corporation, including |
---|
43 | 43 | | the real property and any improvements to the property described by |
---|
44 | 44 | | Section 3 of this Act. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (e) The transfer of any remaining assets of the former |
---|
46 | 46 | | corporation, including the real property and any improvements to |
---|
47 | 47 | | the property described by Section 3 of this Act, serves a public |
---|
48 | 48 | | purpose and benefits the land included in the transfer. |
---|
49 | 49 | | SECTION 3. AMENDMENT. Section 2, Chapter 780, Acts of the |
---|
50 | 50 | | 69th Legislature, Regular Session, 1985, is amended by adding |
---|
51 | 51 | | Subsection (c) to read as follows: |
---|
52 | 52 | | (c) In addition to the territory described by Subsection (a) |
---|
53 | 53 | | of this section, the authority includes all of the property and any |
---|
54 | 54 | | improvements to the property contained in the following area: |
---|
55 | 55 | | Property (including any improvements): |
---|
56 | 56 | | Parcel No. 1 Description |
---|
57 | 57 | | Being a 0.245 acre parcel of land out of Tract 2C, Block 40, San |
---|
58 | 58 | | Elizario Grant in El Paso County, Texas and being more particularly |
---|
59 | 59 | | described by metes and bounds as follows to wit: |
---|
60 | 60 | | Beginning at the most Westerly corner of said Tract 2C, Block 40, |
---|
61 | 61 | | San Elizario Grant; |
---|
62 | 62 | | Thence, along the common line of said Tract 2C and the Cuadrilla |
---|
63 | 63 | | Lateral, North 70° 24' East, 80.79 feet to a point for corner; |
---|
64 | 64 | | Thence, continuing along said common line of said Tract 2C and the |
---|
65 | 65 | | Cuadrilla Lateral, North 63° 40' East, 167.05 feet to a point for |
---|
66 | 66 | | corner; |
---|
67 | 67 | | Thence, South 30° 16' East, 59.35 feet to a point for corner; |
---|
68 | 68 | | Thence, South 61° 24' West, 106.11 feet to a point for corner; |
---|
69 | 69 | | Thence, North 89° 42' West, 162.58 feet to the point of beginning and |
---|
70 | 70 | | containing 10,678.95 square feet or 0.245 acres of land more or |
---|
71 | 71 | | less. |
---|
72 | 72 | | Parcel No. 2 Description |
---|
73 | 73 | | Being a 1.355 acre parcel of land out of Tract 11-A, Block 5, San |
---|
74 | 74 | | Elizario Grant in El Paso County, Texas and being more particularly |
---|
75 | 75 | | described by metes and bounds as follows, to wit: |
---|
76 | 76 | | Beginning at the Northwesterly corner of said Tract 11-A, Block 5, |
---|
77 | 77 | | San Elizario Grant, said point also being on the East right-of-way |
---|
78 | 78 | | line of San Francisco Street as shown on the Cuadrilla Townsite map; |
---|
79 | 79 | | Thence, along the South line of the Cuadrilla Lateral, North 49° 34' |
---|
80 | 80 | | East, 8.30 feet to a point for corner; |
---|
81 | 81 | | Thence, South 89° 42' East, 235.80 feet to a point for corner; |
---|
82 | 82 | | Thence, North 61° 24' East, 106.11 feet to a point for corner; |
---|
83 | 83 | | Thence, South 30° 16' East, 127.00 feet to a point on the North |
---|
84 | 84 | | right-of-way line of the Cuadrilla Cut-Off Road; |
---|
85 | 85 | | Thence along the North right-of-way line of the Cuadrilla Cut-Off |
---|
86 | 86 | | Road, South 59° 44' West, 355.59 feet to the point for corner; |
---|
87 | 87 | | Thence, North 21° 30' West, 251.47 feet to the point of beginning and |
---|
88 | 88 | | containing 59,017.08 square feet or 1.355 acres of land more or |
---|
89 | 89 | | less. |
---|
90 | 90 | | SECTION 4. TRANSFER OF ASSETS AND RESPONSIBILITIES. On the |
---|
91 | 91 | | effective date of this Act, the authority shall assume: |
---|
92 | 92 | | (1) from the El Paso Water Control and Improvement |
---|
93 | 93 | | District No. 4, the responsibility of providing water and |
---|
94 | 94 | | wastewater services to the customers in the service area of the |
---|
95 | 95 | | former corporation; and |
---|
96 | 96 | | (2) the powers, duties, liabilities, and remaining |
---|
97 | 97 | | assets of the former corporation, including the property described |
---|
98 | 98 | | by Section 3 of this Act. |
---|
99 | 99 | | SECTION 5. FINDINGS RELATED TO PROCEDURAL REQUIREMENTS. |
---|
100 | 100 | | (a) The legal notice of the intention to introduce this Act, |
---|
101 | 101 | | setting forth the general substance of this Act, has been published |
---|
102 | 102 | | as provided by law, and the notice and a copy of this Act have been |
---|
103 | 103 | | furnished to all persons, agencies, officials, or entities to which |
---|
104 | 104 | | they are required to be furnished under Section 59, Article XVI, |
---|
105 | 105 | | Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313, Government Code. |
---|
106 | 106 | | (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has |
---|
107 | 107 | | submitted the notice and Act to the commission. |
---|
108 | 108 | | (c) The commission has filed its recommendations relating |
---|
109 | 109 | | to this Act with the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the |
---|
110 | 110 | | speaker of the house of representatives within the required time. |
---|
111 | 111 | | (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this |
---|
112 | 112 | | state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect |
---|
113 | 113 | | to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled |
---|
114 | 114 | | and accomplished. |
---|
115 | 115 | | SECTION 6. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
116 | 116 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
117 | 117 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
118 | 118 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
119 | 119 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
120 | 120 | | * * * * * |
---|