House | 05/04/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 2366 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 1728 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1728 | |
House | 04/19/2013 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Filed |