House | 05/16/2013 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 3674 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2276 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1822 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1824 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1824 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Filed |