E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3814
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5391
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4606
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4607
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1197
|
Journal Page: 4607
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4606
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4292
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2741
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2741
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2741
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2741
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2741
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2741
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2741
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Estes
|
Journal Page: 2740
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2736
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2736
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2909
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3596
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#924
|
Journal Page: 3597
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3597
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3597
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 3089
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3089
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|