Senate | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1293 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1293 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1190 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1914 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Record vote | RV#280 | Journal Page: 1766 |
House | 04/23/2013 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1766 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Amended | 1-Isaac | Journal Page: 1765 |
House | 04/23/2013 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | Journal Page: 1754 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1744 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1743 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1743 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1721 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1720 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Amended | 2-Isaac | Journal Page: 1719 |
House | 04/22/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1173 | |
House | 03/25/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 305 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 305 | |
House | 01/08/2013 | Filed |