Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB402 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: S. Davis of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 402
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013;
33 April 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
44 Affairs and Military Installations; May 9, 2013, reported
55 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 3, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent
66 to printer.)
77
88
99 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1010 AN ACT
1111 relating to a medal for certain members of the state military forces
1212 who served during the Cold War; authorizing a fee.
1313 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1414 SECTION 1. Section 431.134, Government Code, is amended by
1515 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
1616 follows:
1717 (a) The adjutant general may adopt rules and regulations
1818 relating to the:
1919 (1) Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be
2020 awarded to a member of the state military forces who has completed
2121 five years of honorable service during which the person has shown
2222 fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to the
2323 state;
2424 (2) Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded to a
2525 person who was inducted into federal service from the state
2626 military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or after
2727 June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days;
2828 (3) Texas Medal of Merit, which may be presented to a
2929 member of the military forces of this state, another state, or the
3030 United States who performs outstanding service or attains
3131 extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States;
3232 (4) Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which may be
3333 presented to a member of the military forces of this state, another
3434 state, or the United States who has performed service in a superior
3535 and clearly outstanding manner;
3636 (5) Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall be
3737 awarded to a person who completes three consecutive years of
3838 honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the person
3939 has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to
4040 the state;
4141 (6) Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign Medal,
4242 which shall be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal
4343 service from the Texas National Guard after August 1, 1990, in
4444 support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert Storm,
4545 without regard to the place that the person was deployed while
4646 serving on active federal military duty;
4747 (7) Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall be
4848 awarded to a person who:
4949 (A) does not meet the criteria for an award of the
5050 federal Humanitarian Service Medal;
5151 (B) is a member of the state military forces; and
5252 (C) while serving on state active duty or active
5353 duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32 of the United
5454 States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a
5555 mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during
5656 or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state;
5757 (8) Texas Cavalry Medal, which shall be awarded to a
5858 person who:
5959 (A) served on or after September 11, 2001, in the
6060 124th Cavalry, Texas Army National Guard; and
6161 (B) served in a hostile fire zone as designated
6262 by the United States secretary of defense;
6363 (9) Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be
6464 awarded to a member of the Texas National Guard who served, after
6565 September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by the
6666 United States secretary of defense;
6767 (10) Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be awarded
6868 to a person who, after September 11, 2001:
6969 (A) was inducted into federal service from the
7070 Texas National Guard; and
7171 (B) meets the criteria for an award of the
7272 federal Purple Heart Medal;
7373 (11) Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be
7474 awarded to:
7575 (A) a member of the state military forces who
7676 has:
7777 (i) completed 30 or more years of honorable
7878 state service or a combination of state and federal service; and
7979 (ii) continually demonstrated superior
8080 performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions
8181 demanding responsibility; or
8282 (B) a civilian who has contributed significant
8383 service to the state military forces;
8484 (12) Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which shall
8585 be awarded to a member of the state military forces who served:
8686 (A) on or after September 11, 2001;
8787 (B) on state active duty or active duty under
8888 state authority in accordance with Title 32 of the United States
8989 Code; and
9090 (C) satisfactorily in defense support to a
9191 mission in the state under civilian authority;
9292 (13) Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which shall be
9393 awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the
9494 Texas National Guard, without regard to the place that the person
9595 was deployed while serving on active federal military duty, after:
9696 (A) March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi
9797 Freedom; or
9898 (B) August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New
9999 Dawn; [and]
100100 (14) Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which shall be
101101 awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the
102102 Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of Operation
103103 Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the person was
104104 deployed while serving on active federal military duty; and
105105 (15) Cold War Medal, which shall be awarded to a member
106106 of the Texas National Guard or the Texas State Guard who served
107107 between September 2, 1945, and December 26, 1991, subject to
108108 Subsection (c).
109109 (c) A person described by Subsection (a)(15) may be awarded
110110 a Cold War Medal only if a fee in the amount necessary to cover the
111111 costs of awarding the medal is paid to the adjutant general's
112112 department.
113113 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
114114 * * * * *