E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3814
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5380
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5391
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3195
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4666
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1212
|
Journal Page: 4666
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4666
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4536
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2806
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1780
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 737
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1415
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#182
|
Journal Page: 1415
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1415
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1415
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Villarreal and Oliveira
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred directly to s/c on Manufacturing by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 336
|
House
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 336
|
House
|
01/10/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|