Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB45 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 83R15020 SLB-F
22 By: Flynn, Moody, Dale, Sheffield of Bell, H.B. No. 45
33 King of Parker, et al.
44 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 45:
55 By: Menendez C.S.H.B. No. 45
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to the occupational licensing of spouses of members of the
1111 military and the eligibility requirements for certain occupational
1212 licenses issued to applicants with military experience.
1313 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1414 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 51, Occupations Code, is
1515 amended by adding Section 51.4013 to read as follows:
1616 Sec. 51.4013. LICENSE ELIGIBILITY REQUIREMENTS FOR
1717 APPLICANTS WITH MILITARY EXPERIENCE. (a) Notwithstanding any other
1818 law, the department shall credit verified military service,
1919 training, or education toward the licensing requirements, other
2020 than an examination requirement, for a license issued by the
2121 department.
2222 (b) The commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement
2323 this section.
2424 SECTION 2. The heading to Chapter 55, Occupations Code, is
2525 amended to read as follows:
2626 CHAPTER 55. LICENSING OF MILITARY SERVICE MEMBERS, MILITARY
2727 VETERANS, [LICENSE WHILE ON MILITARY DUTY] AND [FOR] MILITARY
2828 SPOUSES [SPOUSE]
2929 SECTION 3. Section 55.001, Occupations Code, is amended by
3030 adding Subdivisions (1-a), (1-b), and (1-c) to read as follows:
3131 (1-a) "Military service member" means a person who is
3232 currently serving in the armed forces of the United States, in a
3333 reserve component of the armed forces of the United States,
3434 including the National Guard, or in the state military service of
3535 any state.
3636 (1-b) "Military spouse" means a person who is married
3737 to a military service member who is currently on active duty.
3838 (1-c) "Military veteran" means a person who served as
3939 a military service member before the date the person applied for a
4040 license in this state.
4141 SECTION 4. Chapter 55, Occupations Code, is amended by
4242 adding Sections 55.005, 55.006, and 55.007 to read as follows:
4343 Sec. 55.005. EXPEDITED LICENSE PROCEDURE FOR MILITARY
4444 SPOUSES. (a) A state agency that issues a license shall, as soon as
4545 practicable after a military spouse files an application for a
4646 license:
4747 (1) process the application; and
4848 (2) issue a license without requiring an examination
4949 to a qualified military spouse applicant who holds a current
5050 license issued by another jurisdiction that has licensing
5151 requirements that are substantially equivalent to the licensing
5252 requirements in this state.
5353 (b) A license issued under this section may not be a
5454 provisional license and must confer the same rights, privileges,
5555 and responsibilities as a license not issued under this section.
5656 Sec. 55.006. RENEWAL OF EXPEDITED LICENSE ISSUED TO
5757 MILITARY SPOUSE. (a) As soon as practicable after a state agency
5858 issues a license under Section 55.005, the state agency shall
5959 determine the requirements for the license holder to renew the
6060 license.
6161 (b) The state agency shall notify the license holder of the
6262 requirements for renewing the license in writing or by electronic
6363 means.
6464 (c) A license issued under Section 55.005 has the term
6565 established by law or state agency rule.
6666 Sec. 55.007. LICENSE ELIGIBILITY REQUIREMENTS FOR
6767 APPLICANTS WITH MILITARY EXPERIENCE. (a) Notwithstanding any
6868 other law, a state agency that issues a license shall, with respect
6969 to an applicant who is a military service member or military
7070 veteran, credit verified military service, training, or education
7171 toward the licensing requirements, other than an examination
7272 requirement, for a license issued by the state agency.
7373 (b) The state agency shall adopt rules necessary to
7474 implement this section.
7575 (c) Rules adopted under this section may not apply to an
7676 applicant who:
7777 (1) holds a restricted license issued by another
7878 jurisdiction; or
7979 (2) has an unacceptable criminal history according to
8080 the law applicable to the state agency.
8181 SECTION 5. Subchapter G, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
8282 amended by adding Section 1701.315 to read as follows:
8383 Sec. 1701.315. LICENSE REQUIREMENTS FOR PERSONS WITH
8484 MILITARY SPECIAL FORCES TRAINING. (a) In this section, "special
8585 forces" means a special forces component of the United States armed
8686 forces, including:
8787 (1) the United States Army Special Forces;
8888 (2) the United States Navy SEALs;
8989 (3) the United States Air Force Pararescue;
9090 (4) the United States Marine Corps Force
9191 Reconnaissance; and
9292 (5) any other component of the United States Special
9393 Operations Command approved by the commission.
9494 (b) The commission shall adopt rules to allow an applicant
9595 to qualify to take an examination described by Section 1701.304 if
9696 the applicant:
9797 (1) has served in the special forces;
9898 (2) has successfully completed a special forces
9999 training course and provides to the commission documentation
100100 verifying completion of the course;
101101 (3) completes a supplemental peace officer training
102102 course; and
103103 (4) completes any other training required by the
104104 commission after the commission has reviewed the applicant's
105105 military training.
106106 (c) Commission rules adopted under Subsection (b) shall
107107 include rules:
108108 (1) to determine acceptable forms of documentation
109109 that satisfy the requirements of Subsection (b)(2);
110110 (2) under which the commission may waive any other
111111 license requirement for an applicant described by Subsection (b)
112112 based on other relevant military training the applicant has
113113 received, as determined by the commission, including intelligence
114114 or medical training; and
115115 (3) to establish an expedited application process for
116116 an applicant described by Subsection (b).
117117 (d) The commission shall review the content of the training
118118 course for each special forces component described by Subsection
119119 (a) and in adopting rules under Subsection (b) provide the training
120120 requirements an applicant who has completed that training course
121121 must complete and the training requirements from which an applicant
122122 who has completed that training course is exempt.
123123 SECTION 6. (a) Section 51.4013, Occupations Code, as added
124124 by this Act, applies only to an application for a license filed with
125125 the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation on or after May 1,
126126 2014. An application for a license filed before May 1, 2014, is
127127 governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date
128128 of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
129129 (b) The Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall
130130 adopt rules under Section 51.4013, Occupations Code, as added by
131131 this Act, not later than March 1, 2014.
132132 (c) Sections 55.005, 55.006, and 55.007, Occupations Code,
133133 as added by this Act, apply only to an application for a license
134134 filed with a state agency as defined by Section 55.001, Occupations
135135 Code, on or after November 1, 2014. An application for a license
136136 filed before November 1, 2014, is governed by the law in effect
137137 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
138138 continued in effect for that purpose.
139139 (d) Each state agency as defined by Section 55.001,
140140 Occupations Code, shall adopt rules under Sections 55.005, 55.006,
141141 and 55.007, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, not later than
142142 September 1, 2014.
143143 (e) Section 1701.315, Occupations Code, as added by this
144144 Act, applies only to an application for a license filed with the
145145 Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education on or
146146 after November 1, 2014. An application for a license filed before
147147 November 1, 2014, is governed by the law in effect immediately
148148 before the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in
149149 effect for that purpose.
150150 (f) The Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and
151151 Education shall adopt rules under Section 1701.315, Occupations
152152 Code, as added by this Act, not later than September 1, 2014.
153153 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
154154 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
155155 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
156156 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
157157 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.