E | 06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5441 | |
E | 05/20/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4076 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2155 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3691 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3910 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3590 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1911 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1911 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1911 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1911 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1911 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1911 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1911 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 889 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1562 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1538 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Record vote | RV#209 | Journal Page: 1538 |
House | 04/12/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1538 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1538 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1527 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1527 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 964 | |
House | 03/12/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 309 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 309 | |
House | 01/10/2013 | Filed |