House | 05/09/2013 | Postponed | 6/1/14 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2912 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2912 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Postponed | 5/9/13 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2113 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Postponed | 5/1/13 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1886 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1886 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 310 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 310 | |
House | 01/10/2013 | Filed |