Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB483 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Aycock (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 483
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 29, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Open
 Government; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 3, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a public hearing held on the issue of making a payment
 in excess of the compensation contracted for by a political
 subdivision.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 180, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 180.007 to read as follows:
 Sec. 180.007.  PAYMENTS IN EXCESS OF CONTRACTUAL AMOUNT.
 (a) A political subdivision may not pay an employee or former
 employee more than an amount owed under a contract with the employee
 unless the political subdivision holds at least one public hearing
 under this section.
 (b)  Notice must be given of the hearing in accordance with
 notice of a public meeting under Subchapter C, Chapter 551,
 Government Code.
 (c)  The governing body of the political subdivision must
 state the following at the public hearing:
 (1)  the reason the payment in excess of the
 contractual amount is being offered to the employee or former
 employee, including the public purpose that will be served by
 making the excess payment; and
 (2)  the exact amount of the excess payment, the source
 of the payment, and the terms for the distribution of the payment
 that effect and maintain the public purpose to be served by making
 the excess payment.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a payment made by a political subdivision on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A payment made before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the payment
 was made, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *