Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB485 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: S. Davis of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 485
 (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 14, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the amount of the fees paid by certain peace officers,
 correctional officers, members of the state military forces, and
 veterans of the armed forces for a license to carry a concealed
 handgun and to the issuance of such a license to certain peace
 officers and members of the state military forces; authorizing a
 fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 411.1951(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this subchapter,
 if the applicant [the department shall reduce by 50 percent any fee
 required for the issuance of an original, duplicate, modified, or
 renewed license under this subchapter if the applicant for the
 license] is a veteran who, more than 365 days preceding the date of
 the application, was honorably discharged from the branch of the
 service in which the applicant [person] served:
 (1)  the applicant must pay a fee of $25 for the
 issuance of an original or renewed license under this subchapter;
 and
 (2)  the department shall reduce by 50 percent any fee
 required of the applicant for a duplicate or modified license under
 this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.1952 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.1952.  REDUCTION OF FEES FOR EMPLOYEES OF TEXAS
 DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE. Notwithstanding any other
 provision of this subchapter, an applicant who is a correctional
 officer of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall pay a fee
 of $25 for the issuance of an original or renewed license under this
 subchapter.
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 411.1991, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.1991.  [ACTIVE] PEACE OFFICERS.
 SECTION 4.  Section 411.1991(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A person who is licensed as a peace officer under
 Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, and is employed [full-time] as a
 peace officer by a law enforcement agency, or a member of the Texas
 military forces, excluding Texas State Guard members who are
 serving in the Texas Legislature may apply for a license under this
 subchapter.  The person shall submit to the department two complete
 sets of legible and classifiable fingerprints and a sworn statement
 of the head of the law enforcement agency employing the
 applicant.  A head of a law enforcement agency may not refuse to
 issue a statement under this subsection.  If the applicant alleges
 that the statement is untrue, the department shall investigate the
 validity of the statement.  The statement must include:
 (1)  the name and rank of the applicant;
 (2)  whether the applicant has been accused of
 misconduct at any time during the applicant's period of employment
 with the agency and the disposition of that accusation;
 (3)  a description of the physical and mental condition
 of the applicant;
 (4)  a list of the types of weapons the applicant has
 demonstrated proficiency with during the preceding year; and
 (5)  a recommendation from the agency head that a
 license be issued to the person under this subchapter.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an applicant for an original, renewed, duplicate, or modified
 license under Chapter 411, Government Code, as amended by this Act,
 who submits the application on or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *