E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 1/1/14
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5389
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3808
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5090
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3690
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4877
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4877
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3283
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3283
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4606
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4606
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4606
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2576
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2576
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1430
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1430
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1383
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2096
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#409
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Amended
|
1-R. Sheffield
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2057
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2057
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Amended
|
3-R. Sheffield
|
Journal Page: 2057
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2055
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1190
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 373
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 373
|
House
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
House
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
House
|
01/14/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|