E
|
06/14/2013
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 221
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 221
|
Journal Page: 5411
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3850
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5380
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1373
|
Journal Page: 5379
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5379
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
|
Journal Page: 5379
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 13, Section 11(a)
|
Journal Page: 5378
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Motion to adopt conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5369
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
|
|
Journal Page: 5175
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3832
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3808
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Motion to suspend rules
|
|
Journal Page: 3808
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3692
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4876
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4876
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3252
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3252
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4073
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2441
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2441
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2441
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2441
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2441
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2441
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2441
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2441
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2441
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA8 Williams
|
Journal Page: 2441
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2440
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2436
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Motion to table
|
|
Journal Page: 2436
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2435
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1935
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2774
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#675
|
Journal Page: 2774
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2774
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2774
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2707
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#664
|
Journal Page: 2706
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2706
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
35-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 2706
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
37-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 2706
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Substitute amendment to amendment tabled
|
38-Walle
|
Journal Page: 2702
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
37-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 2699
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
36-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 2698
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
35-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Amended
|
34-Taylor
|
Journal Page: 2682
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
21-Bohac
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
19-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2662
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 8, Section 5(c)
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Amendment as amended withdrawn
|
5-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 2647
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2638
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2282
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#473
|
Journal Page: 2281
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2281
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2142
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|