By: Hilderbran, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 500 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013; May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance; May 20, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 13, Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 20, 2013, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 500 By: Hegar A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the $1 million total revenue exemption for the franchise tax; temporarily decreasing the rates of the franchise tax. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 171, Tax Code, is amended by adding Section 171.0022 to read as follows: Sec. 171.0022. TEMPORARY PERMISSIVE ALTERNATE RATES. (a) Notwithstanding Section 171.002(a) and subject to Section 171.1016 and Subsection (b) of this section, a taxable entity may elect to pay the tax imposed under this chapter at a rate of 0.95 percent of taxable margin. (b) Notwithstanding Section 171.002(b) and subject to Section 171.1016, a taxable entity primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade as defined by Sections 171.002(c) and (c-1) may elect to pay the tax imposed under this chapter at a rate of 0.475 percent of taxable margin. (c) This section applies only to a report originally due on or after January 1, 2014, and before January 1, 2016. (d) This section expires December 31, 2015. SECTION 2. (a) Section 1(c), Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section 37.01, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, is repealed. (b) This section takes effect September 1, 2013. SECTION 3. (a) Section 2, Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section 37.02, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, and which amended former Subsection (d), Section 171.002, Tax Code, is repealed. (b) This section takes effect September 1, 2013. SECTION 4. (a) Section 3, Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section 37.03, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, and which amended former Subsection (a), Section 171.0021, Tax Code, is repealed. (b) This section takes effect September 1, 2013. SECTION 5. Section 171.006(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) Beginning in 2010, on January 1 of each even-numbered year, the amounts prescribed by Sections 171.002(d)(2)[, 171.0021,] and 171.1013(c) are increased or decreased by an amount equal to the amount prescribed by those sections on December 31 of the preceding year multiplied by the percentage increase or decrease during the preceding state fiscal biennium in the consumer price index and rounded to the nearest $10,000. SECTION 6. Sections 171.0021 and 171.1016(d), Tax Code, are repealed. SECTION 7. This Act applies only to a report originally due on or after January 1, 2014. SECTION 8. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this Act takes effect January 1, 2014. * * * * *