House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5386
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 3766
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3766
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3766
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1074
|
Journal Page: 3766
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3395
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4876
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4876
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3070
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3070
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3070
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4502
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4502
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4502
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3908
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2178
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2178
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2178
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2178
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 2176
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2176
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2175
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1511
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2722
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#557
|
Journal Page: 2481
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2481
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2481
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2440
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Flynn
|
Journal Page: 2439
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2439
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1472
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 340
|
House
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 340
|
House
|
01/14/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|