House
|
04/29/2013
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 1815
|
Journal Page: 1987
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Postponed
|
4/29/13 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1879
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1879
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Postponed
|
4/25/13 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1713
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1713
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Postponed
|
4/22/13 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 340
|
House
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 340
|
House
|
01/15/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|