Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB555 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Callegari (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 555
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain criminal offenses for violations of the law
 regulating metal recycling entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1956.040(a-2), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-2)  An offense under Subsection (a-1) is a Class A
 misdemeanor, except that any [punishable by a] fine imposed may not
 [to] exceed $10,000. If [, unless] it is shown on trial of an [the]
 offense under Subsection (a-1) that the person has previously been
 convicted of a violation of that subsection, [Subsection (a-1), in
 which event] the offense is a state jail felony.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 1956, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1956.204 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1956.204.  GENERAL CRIMINAL PENALTY. (a) A person
 commits an offense if the person violates this chapter or a rule
 adopted under this chapter, including a rule, charter, or ordinance
 adopted, an order issued, or a standard imposed by a county,
 municipality, or political subdivision under Section 1956.003.
 (b)  An offense under this section is a Class C misdemeanor.
 (c)  If conduct that constitutes an offense under this
 section also constitutes an offense under another section in this
 chapter, the person may be prosecuted only under that other
 section.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *