Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB561 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Workman, Eiland, Naishtat H.B. No. 561
 (Senate Sponsor - Seliger)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2013;
 April 25, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Finance; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption for land owned by a school from the
 additional tax imposed on the change of use of land appraised for ad
 valorem tax purposes as qualified open-space land.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 23.55, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (q) to read as follows:
 (q)  The sanctions provided by Subsection (a) do not apply to
 land owned by an organization that qualifies as a school under
 Section 11.21(d) if the organization converts the land to a use for
 which the land is eligible for an exemption under Section 11.21
 within five years.
 SECTION 2.  Section 23.55(q), Tax Code, as added by this Act,
 applies to a change of use of land that occurs on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A change of use of land that occurred
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect when the change of use occurred, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *