Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB567 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Smith (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 567
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013;
33 April 18, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
44 Transportation; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following
55 vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to the definition of an authorized emergency vehicle.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. Section 541.201(1), Transportation Code, is
1313 amended to read as follows:
1414 (1) "Authorized emergency vehicle" means:
1515 (A) a fire department or police vehicle;
1616 (B) a public or private ambulance operated by a
1717 person who has been issued a license by the [Texas] Department of
1818 State Health Services;
1919 (C) an emergency medical services vehicle:
2020 (i) authorized under an emergency medical
2121 services provider license issued by the Department of State Health
2222 Services under Chapter 773, Health and Safety Code; and
2323 (ii) operating under a contract with an
2424 emergency services district that requires the emergency medical
2525 services provider to respond to emergency calls with the vehicle;
2626 (D) a municipal department or public service
2727 corporation emergency vehicle that has been designated or
2828 authorized by the governing body of a municipality;
2929 (E) [(D)] a private vehicle of a volunteer
3030 firefighter or a certified emergency medical services employee or
3131 volunteer when responding to a fire alarm or medical emergency;
3232 (F) [(E)] an industrial emergency response
3333 vehicle, including an industrial ambulance, when responding to an
3434 emergency, but only if the vehicle is operated in compliance with
3535 criteria in effect September 1, 1989, and established by the
3636 predecessor of the Texas Industrial Emergency Services Board of the
3737 State Firemen's and Fire Marshals' Association of Texas;
3838 (G) [(F)] a vehicle of a blood bank or tissue
3939 bank, accredited or approved under the laws of this state or the
4040 United States, when making emergency deliveries of blood, drugs,
4141 medicines, or organs; or
4242 (H) [(G)] a vehicle used for law enforcement
4343 purposes that is owned or leased by a federal governmental entity.
4444 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
4545 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
4646 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
4747 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
4848 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
4949 * * * * *