83R1988 KJM-D By: White H.B. No. 568 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the creation of a select committee to evaluate the effects of reduction in or elimination of federal funding on the state budget due to federal fiscal policy. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subtitle C, Title 10, Government Code, is amended by adding Chapter 2116 to read as follows: CHAPTER 2116. SELECT COMMITTEE ON BUDGET DEPENDENCE ON FEDERAL FUNDING Sec. 2116.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "committee" means the Select Committee on Budget Dependence on Federal Funding. Sec. 2116.002. COMPOSITION. (a) The committee is composed of: (1) four members of the senate, including members from different political parties, appointed by the lieutenant governor based on seniority; (2) four members of the house of representatives, including members from different political parties, appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives based on seniority; (3) a representative of a nonprofit or charitable organization appointed by the governor; (4) a representative of an advocacy organization focused on state and federal fiscal matters appointed by the governor; (5) a representative of the Legislative Budget Board appointed by the Legislative Budget Board; and (6) a representative of the comptroller's office, appointed by the comptroller. (b) The committee shall elect a presiding officer from among its members. Sec. 2116.003. COMPENSATION. A committee member serves without compensation but is entitled to reimbursement for actual and necessary expenses incurred in performing functions as a committee member, subject to any applicable limitation on reimbursement provided by general law or the General Appropriations Act. Sec. 2116.004. COMMITTEE DUTIES. The committee shall: (1) meet at the call of the presiding officer; (2) conduct a study on: (A) the percentage of the state budget that is funded by federal money; and (B) the effects on the state budget if federal fiscal policy necessitates a significant reduction in or elimination of federal funding for state governments; and (3) create a plan to address the loss of federal money, including federal Medicaid matching money and federal social security payments, and maintain benefit programs and other essential state services if federal fiscal policy necessitates a significant reduction in or elimination of federal funding for state governments. Sec. 2116.005. REPORT. Not later than September 1, 2014, the committee shall submit a report based on its findings to: (1) the governor; (2) the lieutenant governor; and (3) the speaker of the house of representatives. Sec. 2116.006. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires and the committee is abolished December 1, 2014. SECTION 2. (a) Not later than October 1, 2013, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, the governor, the comptroller of public accounts, and the Legislative Budget Board shall make the appointments and designations required by Section 2116.002(a), Government Code, as added by this Act. (b) Not later than November 1, 2013, the governor shall call the first meeting of the Select Committee on Budget Dependence on Federal Funding to permit the committee to elect a presiding officer as required by Section 2116.002(b), Government Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.