Senate | 05/03/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1383 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2277 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2099 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Record vote | RV#412 | Journal Page: 2098 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2098 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2098 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2059 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2059 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2059 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 964 | |
House | 03/12/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 367 | |
House | 02/14/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 367 | |
House | 01/17/2013 | Filed |