Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB584 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodriguez of Travis (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) H.B. No. 584
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 1, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 1, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the posting of a notice of foreclosure sale on a
 county's Internet website.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.002, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f-1) to read as follows:
 (f-1)  If a county maintains an Internet website, the county
 must post a notice of sale filed with the county clerk under
 Subsection (b)(2) on the website on a page that is publicly
 available for viewing without charge or registration.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *