E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3762
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1306
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4983
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5385
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3757
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3587
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4877
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4877
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3284
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3284
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4648
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4648
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4648
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2589
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2589
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2589
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2589
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Estes
|
Journal Page: 2584
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2584
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2584
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2584
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2583
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2583
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1905
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1862
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1780
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#777
|
Journal Page: 3058
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3058
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3058
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2987
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 2987
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2986
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 446
|
House
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 446
|
House
|
01/18/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|