1 | 1 | | By: Craddick (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 588 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 18, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
---|
4 | 4 | | and Human Services; May 13, 2013, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the regulation of the practice of physical therapy; |
---|
11 | 11 | | authorizing fees. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 453.151, Occupations Code, is amended by |
---|
14 | 14 | | adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (c) Information maintained by the executive council or the |
---|
16 | 16 | | board under this chapter regarding the home address or personal |
---|
17 | 17 | | telephone number of a person licensed under this chapter or a person |
---|
18 | 18 | | who is an owner or manager of a physical therapy facility registered |
---|
19 | 19 | | under this chapter is confidential and not subject to disclosure |
---|
20 | 20 | | under Chapter 552, Government Code. A person licensed under this |
---|
21 | 21 | | chapter or a person who is an owner or manager of a physical therapy |
---|
22 | 22 | | facility registered under this chapter must provide the board with |
---|
23 | 23 | | a business address or address of record that will be subject to |
---|
24 | 24 | | disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code. |
---|
25 | 25 | | SECTION 2. Section 453.212, Occupations Code, is amended to |
---|
26 | 26 | | read as follows: |
---|
27 | 27 | | Sec. 453.212. DISPLAY OF LICENSE [AND RENEWAL CERTIFICATE]. |
---|
28 | 28 | | A license holder under this chapter shall display the license |
---|
29 | 29 | | holder's license [and renewal certificate] in a conspicuous place |
---|
30 | 30 | | in the principal office in which the license holder practices |
---|
31 | 31 | | physical therapy. |
---|
32 | 32 | | SECTION 3. Sections 453.252(b), (c), and (d), Occupations |
---|
33 | 33 | | Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
34 | 34 | | (b) A person whose license has been expired for 90 days or |
---|
35 | 35 | | less may renew the license by paying to the executive council the |
---|
36 | 36 | | renewal fee and a late fee set by the executive council in an amount |
---|
37 | 37 | | that does not exceed one-half [that is equal to half] of the amount |
---|
38 | 38 | | charged for examination for the license. If a person's license has |
---|
39 | 39 | | been expired for more than 90 days but less than one year, the |
---|
40 | 40 | | person may renew the license by paying to the executive council all |
---|
41 | 41 | | unpaid renewal fees and a late fee set by the executive council in |
---|
42 | 42 | | an amount that does not exceed [that is equal to] the amount charged |
---|
43 | 43 | | for examination for the license. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (c) A person whose license has been expired for one year or |
---|
45 | 45 | | longer must comply with the board's requirements and procedures to |
---|
46 | 46 | | reinstate the license and pay a reinstatement fee in the amount set |
---|
47 | 47 | | by the executive council [may not renew the license]. If the person |
---|
48 | 48 | | is unable to comply with the board's requirements to reinstate the |
---|
49 | 49 | | license, the [The] person may obtain a new license by submitting to |
---|
50 | 50 | | reexamination and complying with the requirements and procedures |
---|
51 | 51 | | for obtaining an original license. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (d) At least 30 days before the expiration of a person's |
---|
53 | 53 | | license, the executive council shall provide the person with [send |
---|
54 | 54 | | written] notice of the impending license expiration [to the person |
---|
55 | 55 | | at the person's last known address according to the records of the |
---|
56 | 56 | | executive council]. |
---|
57 | 57 | | SECTION 4. Section 453.253, Occupations Code, is amended to |
---|
58 | 58 | | read as follows: |
---|
59 | 59 | | Sec. 453.253. RENEWAL OF EXPIRED LICENSE BY OUT-OF-STATE |
---|
60 | 60 | | PRACTITIONER. (a) The board may renew without reexamination the |
---|
61 | 61 | | expired license of a person who was licensed to practice as a |
---|
62 | 62 | | physical therapist or physical therapist assistant in this state, |
---|
63 | 63 | | moved to another state, [and] is currently licensed and in good |
---|
64 | 64 | | standing [has been in practice] in the other state, and meets the |
---|
65 | 65 | | board's requirements for renewal [for the two years preceding |
---|
66 | 66 | | application]. |
---|
67 | 67 | | (b) The person must pay to the executive council a renewal |
---|
68 | 68 | | fee set by the executive council in an amount that does not exceed |
---|
69 | 69 | | [that is equal to] the examination fee for the license. |
---|
70 | 70 | | SECTION 5. (a) Not later than December 1, 2013, the Texas |
---|
71 | 71 | | Board of Physical Therapy Examiners and the Executive Council of |
---|
72 | 72 | | Physical Therapy and Occupational Therapy Examiners shall adopt |
---|
73 | 73 | | rules and fees necessary to implement Sections 453.252 and 453.253, |
---|
74 | 74 | | Occupations Code, as amended by this Act. |
---|
75 | 75 | | (b) Sections 453.252 and 453.253, Occupations Code, as |
---|
76 | 76 | | amended by this Act, apply only to the renewal of a physical |
---|
77 | 77 | | therapist or physical therapist assistant license that expires on |
---|
78 | 78 | | or after December 1, 2013. A license that expires before that date |
---|
79 | 79 | | is governed by the law in effect on the date the license expires, |
---|
80 | 80 | | and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
81 | 81 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
82 | 82 | | * * * * * |
---|