E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4870
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4539
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1571
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1571
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#441
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Postponed
|
4/30/13 4:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 2059
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2059
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1225
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 368
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 368
|
House
|
01/18/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|