E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3814
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5380
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3240
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4724
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1226
|
Journal Page: 4724
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4724
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4539
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1571
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1571
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#514
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2338
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2338
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
3-Taylor
|
Journal Page: 2336
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Amended
|
2-Hernandez Luna and Sheets
|
Journal Page: 2336
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2336
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2075
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1974
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
|
|
Journal Page: 470
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 470
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 368
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 368
|
House
|
01/18/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|