1 | 1 | | By: Guillen, Lozano (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 597 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Agriculture, Rural Affairs, and Homeland Security; May 2, 2013, |
---|
5 | 5 | | reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; |
---|
6 | 6 | | May 2, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to boater education and examinations on preventing the |
---|
12 | 12 | | spread of exotic harmful or potentially harmful aquatic plants, |
---|
13 | 13 | | fish, and shellfish. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 31.108, Parks and Wildlife Code, is |
---|
16 | 16 | | amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (a-1) A boater education course or equivalency examination |
---|
18 | 18 | | under this section must include information on how to prevent the |
---|
19 | 19 | | spread of exotic harmful or potentially harmful aquatic plants, |
---|
20 | 20 | | fish, and shellfish, including department-approved methods for |
---|
21 | 21 | | cleaning: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (1) a boat; |
---|
23 | 23 | | (2) a boat's motor; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (3) fishing and other equipment; and |
---|
25 | 25 | | (4) a boat trailer. |
---|
26 | 26 | | SECTION 2. The Parks and Wildlife Department boater |
---|
27 | 27 | | education courses and equivalency examinations must include |
---|
28 | 28 | | information on how to prevent the spread of exotic harmful or |
---|
29 | 29 | | potentially harmful aquatic plants, fish, and shellfish as required |
---|
30 | 30 | | by Section 31.108(a-1), Parks and Wildlife Code, as added by this |
---|
31 | 31 | | Act, on or before January 1, 2014. |
---|
32 | 32 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
33 | 33 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
34 | 34 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
35 | 35 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
36 | 36 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
37 | 37 | | * * * * * |
---|