Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB62 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 62
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a justice or judge having an interest in a business
 entity that owns, manages, or operates a private correctional or
 rehabilitation facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 21, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 21.010 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.010.  FINANCIAL INTEREST IN PRIVATE CORRECTIONAL AND
 REHABILITATION FACILITIES PROHIBITED. (a)  A justice or judge, as
 applicable, of the supreme court, the court of criminal appeals, a
 court of appeals, a district court, a county court, a county court
 at law, or a statutory probate court may not, on the date the person
 takes office as a justice or judge or while serving as a justice or
 judge, have a significant interest in a business entity that owns,
 manages, or operates:
 (1)  a community residential facility described by
 Section 508.119;
 (2)  a correctional or rehabilitation facility subject
 to Chapter 244, Local Government Code; or
 (3)  any other facility intended to accomplish a
 purpose or provide a service described by Section 508.119(a) to a
 person convicted of a misdemeanor or felony or found to have engaged
 in delinquent conduct who is housed in the facility:
 (A)  while serving a sentence of confinement
 following conviction of an offense or an adjudication of delinquent
 conduct; or
 (B)  as a condition of community supervision,
 probation, parole, or mandatory supervision.
 (b)  A justice or judge is considered to have a significant
 interest in a business entity described by Subsection (a) for
 purposes of this section if:
 (1)  the justice or judge owns any voting stock or share
 or has a direct investment in the business entity that represents
 the lesser of at least 10 percent or $15,000 of the fair market
 value of the business entity; or
 (2)  the justice or judge receives money from the
 business entity.
 (c)  A violation of this section by a justice or judge is
 considered a violation of Canon 4D(1), Code of Judicial Conduct.  A
 justice or judge who has an interest in a business entity that is
 prohibited by this section must report the interest to the State
 Commission on Judicial Conduct.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2015.
 * * * * *